Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Bernardus NiŽnhaus

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Utrecht

Titular Bishop of Benda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1929BornGendt
24 Jul 195525.9Ordained PriestPriest of Utrecht, Netherlands
15 Jan 198252.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
15 Jan 198252.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Benda
6 Mar 198252.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Benda
1 Sep 199970.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
5 Dec 200071.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Utrecht, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Johannes Bernardus NiŽnhaus:
Bishop Johannes Bernardus NiŽnhaus (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Utrecht

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013