Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cornelius de Wit, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of San Jose de Antique

Titular Bishop of Respecta

Superior General of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1922BornHilversum, Netherlands
14 Jul 194624.0Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
12 Apr 196239.7AppointedPrelate of San Jose de Antique, Philippines
12 Apr 196239.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Amisus
19 Jun 196239.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amisus
18 Feb 197855.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Amisus
3 Aug 198260.0AppointedSuperior General of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
9 Aug 198260.1ResignedPrelate of San Jose de Antique, Philippines
22 Jan 198360.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Respecta
8 Mar 200279.6DiedPrelate Emeritus of San Jose de Antique, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Cornelius de Wit:
Bishop Cornelius de Wit M.H.M. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of San Jose de Antique

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 39.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 82
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013