Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Van Het Velde de Campo, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands

Titular Bishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jan 1523AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
7 Jan 1523AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia
22 Mar 1523Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia
30 Sep 1528DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Jan Van Het Velde de Campo
Bishop Jan Van Het Velde de Campo O. Carm. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Utrecht

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBruxelles
Ordained BishopEnghien, Belgium
Death PlaceBruges

  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 209
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1523, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 10 Jun 2018

Quantcast