Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor João Herman José Tielbeek, SS.CC. †

Deceased

Bishop of Formosa, Goias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1919BornRaalte, Netherlands
4 Aug 194627.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Hearts of Jesus and Mary
4 Feb 196141.5AppointedPrelate of Formosa, Goias, Brazil
4 Feb 196141.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Numidia
9 Apr 196141.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Numidia
26 May 197858.8ResignedTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Numidia
4 Dec 197960.3AppointedBishop of Formosa, Goias, Brazil
24 Dec 199778.4DiedBishop of Formosa, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Victor João Herman José Tielbeek:
Bishop Victor João Herman José Tielbeek SS.CC. (born , died ) Bishop of Formosa

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013