Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann von Virneburg

Deceased

Bishop of Utrecht


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Jun 1363AppointedBishop of Münster, Germany
24 Apr 1364AppointedBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
23 Jun 1371DiedBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Johann von Virneburg:
Bishop Johann von Virneburg (died ) Bishop of Utrecht

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 346, and Page 491

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 21 Jan 2016