Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adrianus Herman van Luyn, S.D.B.

Bishop Emeritus of Rotterdam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1935 BornGroningen
9 Feb 196428.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
27 Nov 199358.3AppointedBishop of Rotterdam, Netherlands
12 Feb 199458.5Ordained BishopBishop of Rotterdam, Netherlands
14 Jan 201175.4RetiredBishop of Rotterdam, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Adrianus Herman van Luyn:
Bishop Adrianus Herman van Luyn S.D.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Rotterdam

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rotterdam.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,249

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013