Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pieter Antoon Nierman

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Groningen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1901BornHilversum
15 Aug 192423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Utrecht, Netherlands
10 Mar 195655.1AppointedBishop of Groningen, Netherlands
11 May 195655.3Ordained BishopBishop of Groningen, Netherlands
21 May 196968.3ResignedBishop of Groningen, Netherlands
21 May 196968.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Oppidum Consilinum
29 Nov 197069.8ResignedTitular Bishop of Oppidum Consilinum
15 Sep 197675.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Groningen, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Pieter Antoon Nierman:
Bishop Pieter Antoon Nierman (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Groningen

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013