Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Willem Cardinal van Enckenvoirt (Enkewort)

Deceased

Bishop of Utrecht, Netherlands

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

Bishop of Tortosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1464²Born
11 Mar 152359.1AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
10 Sep 152359.6Elevated to Cardinal
10 Sep 152359.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
1 Oct 152965.7AppointedBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
19 Jul 153470.5DiedBishop of Utrecht, Netherlands

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Willem van Enckenvoirt (Enkewort) (VIAF: 62612866)
Willem Cardinal van Enckenvoirt (Enkewort) (born 1464, died ) Bishop of Utrecht

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUtrecht, Diocese of Utrecht
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 10.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Sep 1523
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 36, Number 161
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 186, and Page 316
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1523, Number 11*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast