Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joannes Maria Michael Holterman, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Willemstad, Netherlands Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1906BornZwolle, Netherlands
15 Jul 193124.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
9 Dec 195650.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Curaçao, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles
9 Dec 195650.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Vagada
25 Feb 195750.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vagada
14 Jun 195851.6AppointedBishop of Willemstad, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles
7 Aug 197366.8ResignedBishop of Willemstad, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles
22 Oct 198882.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Willemstad, Netherlands Antilles, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Joannes Maria Michael Holterman:
Bishop Joannes Maria Michael Holterman O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Willemstad

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013