Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vital João Geraldo Wilderink, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Itaguaí, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1931Born
7 Jul 195725.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
5 Jun 197846.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barra do Piraí-Volta Redonda, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
5 Jun 197846.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Iunca in Byzacena
13 Aug 197846.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iunca in Byzacena
21 Apr 198048.3AppointedBishop of Itaguaí, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
8 Jul 199866.6ResignedBishop of Itaguaí, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
11 Jun 201482.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Itaguaí, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Vital João Geraldo Wilderink
Bishop Vital João Geraldo Wilderink O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Itaguaí

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDevender, Netherlands

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 12 Jun 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast