Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Kinzie Fitzsimons

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Salina, Kansas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1928Born
18 Mar 196132.5Ordained PriestPriest of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
20 May 197546.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
20 May 197546.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Pertusa
3 Jul 197546.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pertusa
28 Mar 198455.5AppointedBishop of Salina, Kansas, USA
29 May 198455.7InstalledBishop of Salina, Kansas, USA
21 Oct 200476.1RetiredBishop of Salina, Kansas, USA
28 Jul 201384.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Salina, Kansas, USA

MicroData Summary for George Kinzie Fitzsimons
Bishop George Kinzie Fitzsimons (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Salina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKansas City, MO, Diocese of Kansas City, Missouri

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 29 Jul 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018