Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jerome Edward Listecki

Archbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1949 BornChicago
14 May 197526.1Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
7 Nov 200051.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
7 Nov 200051.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Nara
8 Jan 200151.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nara
29 Dec 200455.7AppointedBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
1 Mar 200555.9InstalledBishop of La Crosse, Wisconsin, USA
14 Nov 200960.6AppointedArchbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
4 Jan 201060.8InstalledArchbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for Jerome Edward Listecki
Archbishop Jerome Edward Listecki (born ) Archbishop of Milwaukee

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Milwaukee.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,880
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 18 Feb 2016