Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerald Frederick Kicanas

Bishop Emeritus of Tucson, Arizona, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1941 Born
27 Apr 196725.6Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
24 Jan 199553.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
24 Jan 199553.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bela
20 Mar 199553.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bela
30 Oct 200160.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tucson, Arizona, USA
15 Jan 200260.4InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Tucson, Arizona, USA
7 Mar 200361.5SucceededBishop of Tucson, Arizona, USA
3 Oct 201776.1RetiredBishop of Tucson, Arizona, USA

MicroData Summary for Gerald Frederick Kicanas
Bishop Gerald Frederick Kicanas (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Tucson

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Ordained BishopHoly Name, Cathedral, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tucson.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,497
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 3 Oct 2017