Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Joseph Kane

Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois

Titular Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie in Michigan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1942 BornChicago
14 May 196926.5Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
24 Jan 200360.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
24 Jan 200360.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie in Michigan
19 Mar 200360.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie in Michigan

MicroData Summary for Francis Joseph Kane:
Bishop Francis Joseph Kane (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Chicago.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,348

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013