Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Conway McNabb, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chulucanas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1925BornBeloit, WI, USA
10 Sep 194519.7ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
10 Sep 194822.7Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
24 May 195226.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
4 Mar 196438.2AppointedPrelate of Chulucanas, Peru
8 Apr 196741.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Saia Maior
17 Jun 196741.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Saia Maior
27 Dec 197752.0ResignedTitular Bishop of Saia Maior
12 Dec 198863.0AppointedBishop of Chulucanas, Peru
28 Oct 200074.8RetiredBishop of Chulucanas, Peru
26 Feb 201690.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Chulucanas, Peru

MicroData Summary for Juan Conway McNabb
Bishop Juan Conway McNabb O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chulucanas

  • a priest for 63.7 years
  • a bishop for 48.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146
  • prof/sole/c1/d: CB, 27 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 27 Feb 2016