Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George James Rassas

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chicago, Illinois, USA

Titular Bishop of Reperi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1942 Born
2 May 196825.9Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
1 Dec 200563.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
1 Dec 200563.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Reperi
2 Feb 200663.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Reperi
3 Jul 201876.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for George James Rassas
Bishop George James Rassas (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Chicago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaltimore
Ordained BishopHoly Name, Cathedral, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Chicago.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,049
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 3 Jul 2018

Quantcast