Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Raleigh

Dioecesis Raleighiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of North Carolina
3 March 1868ErectedDiocese of Charleston Vicariate Apostolic of North Carolina (erected)
8 June 1910Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of North Carolina (Gaston, Catawba, Cleveland, Burke, Lincoln, McDowell, Polk, and Rutherford Counties) Territorial Abbey of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians (erected)
Diocese of Raleigh
12 December 1924ErectedVicariate Apostolic of North Carolina (Name changed and Vicariate raised to a Diocese) Diocese of Raleigh (erected)
17 April 1944Territory AddedTerritorial Abbey of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians (Catawba, Cleveland, Burke, Lincoln, McDowell, Polk, and Rutherford Counties) Diocese of Raleigh
July 1960Territory AddedTerritorial Abbey of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians (Gaston County) Diocese of Raleigh
10 February 1962Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Raleigh (From Baltimore to Atlanta)
12 November 1971Territory LostDiocese of Raleigh Diocese of Charlotte (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Raleigh
195022,0674,051,740.5%90771671327732389ap1951
196656,0104,880,0001.1%1274016733546468108ap1967
197063,6395,640,0001.1%102102623165106ap1971
197643,0592,480,3931.7%5525805382911159ap1977
198046,2912,970,0221.6%58228057822912558ap1981
199073,8933,105,5002.4%61431047108519465ap1991
1999141,5153,646,0353.9%82581401,0102269070ap2000
2000152,4933,654,4774.2%75541291,18223608673ap2001
2001167,5373,697,5884.5%93511441,16321587675ap2002
2002172,1633,811,4234.5%98541521,13224637777ap2003
2003179,4933,934,2044.6%98551531,17329637278ap2004
2004180,9094,024,2534.5%99511501,20629576378ap2005
2010217,1254,432,9014.9%113491621,34040525378ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 12 Aug 2013