Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas John Joseph Paprocki

Bishop of Springfield in Illinois, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1952 Born
10 May 197825.7Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
24 Jan 200350.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
24 Jan 200350.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Vulturaria
19 Mar 200350.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vulturaria
20 Apr 201057.7AppointedBishop of Springfield in Illinois, USA
22 Jun 201057.8InstalledBishop of Springfield in Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas John Joseph Paprocki
Bishop Thomas John Joseph Paprocki (born ) Bishop of Springfield in Illinois

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Ordained BishopHoly Name, Cathedral, Chicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Springfield in Illinois.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Apr 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,349
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast