Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mário Roberto Emmett Anglim, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Prelate of Coari, Amazonas, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Gaguari

Apostolic Administrator of Lábrea, Amazonas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1922Born
2 Feb 194219.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
6 Jan 194825.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
24 Apr 196442.1AppointedPrelate of Coari, Amazonas, Brazil
23 Mar 196644.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Gaguari
2 Jun 196644.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gaguari
2 May 197048.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lábrea, Amazonas, Brazil
13 Apr 197351.1DiedPrelate of Coari, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Mário Roberto Emmett Anglim
Bishop Mário Roberto Emmett Anglim C.SS.R. (born , died ) Prelate of Coari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLombard, IL, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois, USA
Ordained PriestOconomowoc, Archdiocese of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA

  • a priest for 25.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 19 Feb 2018