Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Rudolph Zuroweste

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Belleville, Illinois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1901BornEast Saint Louis
8 Jun 192423.1Ordained PriestPriest of Belleville, Illinois, USA
29 Nov 194746.6AppointedBishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA
29 Jan 194846.8Ordained BishopBishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA
30 Aug 197675.3RetiredBishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA
28 Mar 198785.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Belleville, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Albert Rudolph Zuroweste:
Bishop Albert Rudolph Zuroweste (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Belleville

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013