Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Ryan Patrick Dempsey

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

Titular Bishop of Truentum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1918Born
1 May 194324.6Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
2 May 196849.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
2 May 196849.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Truentum
13 Jun 196849.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Truentum
8 Jan 197455.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Ryan Patrick Dempsey
Bishop Michael Ryan Patrick Dempsey (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chicago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago

  • a priest for 30.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast