Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond James Vonesh

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Joliet in Illinois

Titular Bishop of Vanariona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1916BornChicago
3 May 194125.3Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
5 Jan 196851.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA
5 Jan 196851.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Vanariona
3 Apr 196852.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vanariona
7 May 199175.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA
16 Aug 199175.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Joliet in Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Raymond James Vonesh:
Bishop Raymond James Vonesh (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Joliet in Illinois

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013