Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gustavo Posada Peláez, M.X.Y. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Istmina-Tadó


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1917BornFredonia
12 Nov 193922.7Ordained PriestPriest of Misioneros Javerianos de Yarumal
24 Mar 195336.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Istmina, Colombia
24 Mar 195336.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Zaliche
24 May 195336.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zaliche
30 Apr 199073.2AppointedBishop of Istmina-Tadó, Colombia
5 May 199376.2RetiredBishop of Istmina-Tadó, Colombia
8 Dec 199982.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Istmina-Tadó, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Gustavo Posada Peláez:
Bishop Gustavo Posada Peláez M.X.Y. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Istmina-Tadó

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 46.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 27 Jul 2015