Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tiberio de Jesús Salazar y Herrera

Deceased

Archbishop of Medellín


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1871BornGranada
12 Jun 189725.9Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 192250.9AppointedBishop of Manizales, Colombia
19 Nov 192251.3Ordained BishopBishop of Manizales, Colombia
3 Dec 192251.4InstalledBishop of Manizales, Colombia
7 Jul 193260.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Medellín, Colombia
7 Jul 193260.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhizaeum
22 Jun 193765.9SucceededArchbishop of Medellín, Colombia
4 Mar 194270.6DiedArchbishop of Medellín, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Tiberio de Jesús Salazar y Herrera:
Archbishop Tiberio de Jesús Salazar y Herrera (born , died ) Archbishop of Medellín

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013