Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardo Botero Álvarez, C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1891Born
23 Jun 191826.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
5 Jul 194452.9AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
24 Aug 194453.1Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
29 May 195664.8AppointedArchbishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
28 Jun 195967.9DiedArchbishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Botero Álvarez
Archbishop Bernardo Botero Álvarez C.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Nueva Pamplona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSonsón
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bogotá, Archdiocese of Bogotá

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1944, Number 37
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 623
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 664, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast