Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Ignacio Montoya Peláez

Deceased

Bishop of Medellín, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1816Born
7 Jun 184023.8Ordained PriestPriest of Medellín, Colombia
7 Apr 187659.7AppointedBishop of Medellín, Colombia
23 Jul 187660.0Ordained BishopBishop of Medellín, Colombia
15 Jul 188467.9DiedBishop of Medellín, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José Ignacio Montoya Peláez
Bishop José Ignacio Montoya Peláez (born , died ) Bishop of Medellín

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMedellin, Diocese of Medellín
Ordained BishopLa Candelaria, Church, Medellin, Diocese of Medellín

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 375
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast