Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Fernando Rodríguez Velásquez

Auxiliary Bishop of Cali

Titular Bishop of Illiberi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1959 BornMedellín
25 Aug 198424.7Ordained PriestPriest of Medellín, Colombia
5 Jul 201454.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cali, Colombia
5 Jul 201454.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Illiberi
22 Aug 201454.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Illiberi

MicroData Summary for Luis Fernando Rodríguez Velásquez:
Bishop Luis Fernando Rodríguez Velásquez (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Cali

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Cali.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jul 2014
  • ob: CB, 5 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 7 Jul 2014