Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rodrigo Arango Velásquez, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Buga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1925BornBetania
3 Jun 195025.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
29 Jan 198155.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Medellín, Colombia
29 Jan 198155.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Casae in Numidia
25 Mar 198156.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casae in Numidia
17 Jan 198559.8AppointedBishop of Buga, Colombia
19 Jan 200175.8RetiredBishop of Buga, Colombia
27 Dec 200883.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Buga, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Rodrigo Arango Velásquez:
Bishop Rodrigo Arango Velásquez P.S.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Buga

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015