Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jorge Alberto Ossa Soto

Archbishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1956 Born
23 May 198225.8Ordained PriestPriest of Istmina-Tadó, Colombia
21 Jan 200346.4AppointedBishop of Florencia, Colombia
1 Mar 200346.5Ordained BishopBishop of Florencia, Colombia
29 Mar 200346.6InstalledBishop of Florencia, Colombia
15 Jul 201154.9AppointedBishop of Santa Rosa de Osos, Colombia
15 Oct 201963.2AppointedArchbishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
28 Nov 201963.3InstalledArchbishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Jorge Alberto Ossa Soto
Archbishop Jorge Alberto Ossa Soto (born ) Archbishop of Nueva Pamplona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEl Carmen de Viboral
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora del Carmen, Church, El Carmen de Viboral

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Nueva Pamplona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,340
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2019
  • i: CB, 27 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 28 Oct 2019

Quantcast