Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugo Alberto Torres Marín

Auxiliary Bishop of Medellín

Titular Bishop of Bossa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1960 BornBriceńo
24 Nov 198727.3Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Rosa de Osos, Colombia
4 May 201150.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Medellín, Colombia
4 May 201150.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bossa
4 Jun 201150.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bossa

MicroData Summary for Hugo Alberto Torres Marín:
Bishop Hugo Alberto Torres Marín (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Medellín

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Medellín.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 6 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,068

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013