Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilberto Jiménez Narváez

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Medellín

Titular Bishop of Apollonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1937BornAbejorral
1 Sep 196326.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jul 199659.4AppointedBishop of Riohacha, Colombia
7 Sep 199659.5Ordained BishopBishop of Riohacha, Colombia
8 Mar 200164.0ResignedBishop of Riohacha, Colombia
20 Mar 200164.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Medellín, Colombia
20 Mar 200164.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonia
25 Feb 201275.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Medellín, Colombia
20 Oct 201578.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Medellín, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Gilberto Jiménez Narváez:
Bishop Gilberto Jiménez Narváez (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Medellín

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,845
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Feb 2012
  • d: CB, 20 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015