Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jairo Jaramillo Monsalve

Archbishop Emeritus of Barranquilla, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1940 Born
26 Jul 196625.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sonsón-Rionegro, Colombia
16 Jul 198847.6AppointedBishop of Riohacha, Colombia
9 Sep 198847.7Ordained BishopBishop of Riohacha, Colombia
10 Jun 199554.5AppointedBishop of Santa Rosa de Osos, Colombia
13 Nov 201069.9AppointedArchbishop of Barranquilla, Colombia
11 Dec 201070.0InstalledArchbishop of Barranquilla, Colombia
14 Nov 201776.9RetiredArchbishop of Barranquilla, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Jairo Jaramillo Monsalve
Archbishop Jairo Jaramillo Monsalve (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Barranquilla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRionegro
Ordained BishopS. Nicolas, Cathedral, Rionegro, Diocese of Sonsón-Rionegro

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Barranquilla.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,238
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast