Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Roberto López Londoño

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jericó, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1937Born
26 Aug 196225.1Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 198244.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Medellín, Colombia
24 May 198244.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Urbs Salvia
3 Jul 198245.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Urbs Salvia
9 May 198749.8AppointedBishop of Armenia, Colombia
7 Oct 200366.2AppointedBishop of Jericó, Colombia
13 Jun 201375.9RetiredBishop of Jericó, Colombia
21 Sep 201881.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Jericó, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José Roberto López Londoño
Bishop José Roberto López Londoño (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jericó

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYalí
Death PlaceMedellín, Archdiocese of Medellín

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2013
  • d: CB, 21 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 13 Dec 2018

Quantcast