Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tulio Botero Salazar, C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Medellín


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1904BornManizales
19 Dec 193127.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
7 May 194945.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cartagena, Colombia
7 May 194945.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Marida
14 Aug 194945.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marida
1 May 195248.1AppointedBishop of Zipaquirá, Colombia
8 Dec 195753.7AppointedArchbishop of Medellín, Colombia
2 Jun 197975.2RetiredArchbishop of Medellín, Colombia
1 Mar 198177.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Medellín, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Tulio Botero Salazar:
Archbishop Tulio Botero Salazar C.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Medellín

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Mar 2014