Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Alberto Correa Martínez

Vicar Apostolic of Guapi

Titular Bishop of Severiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1968 BornMedellín
27 Nov 199325.4Ordained PriestPriest of Sonsón-Rionegro, Colombia
3 Dec 201345.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Guapi, Colombia
3 Dec 201345.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Severiana
15 Feb 201445.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Severiana

MicroData Summary for Carlos Alberto Correa Martínez:
Bishop Carlos Alberto Correa Martínez (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Guapi

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Guapi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2013
  • c2: CB, 3 Dec 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 16 Dec 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 31 Mar 2014