Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Octavio Betancourt Arango

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Garzón, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1928Born
1 Nov 195123.8Ordained PriestPriest of Medellín, Colombia
23 Nov 197042.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Medellín, Colombia
23 Nov 197042.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Germania in Dacia
2 Feb 197143.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germania in Dacia
10 Nov 197547.8AppointedBishop of Garzón, Colombia
26 Apr 197749.3ResignedBishop of Garzón, Colombia
18 Jun 201789.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Garzón, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Octavio Betancourt Arango
Bishop Octavio Betancourt Arango (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Garzón

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbejorral
Death PlaceMedellín, Archdiocese of Medellín

  • a priest for 65.6 years
  • a bishop for 46.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • opd/c1: CB, 25 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Jun 2017