Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillermo Orozco Montoya

Bishop of Girardota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1946 BornSonsón
29 Jun 197023.9Ordained PriestPriest of Sonsón-Rionegro, Colombia
17 Jan 200659.4AppointedBishop of San José del Guaviare, Colombia
10 Mar 200659.6Ordained BishopBishop of San José del Guaviare, Colombia
2 Feb 201063.5AppointedBishop of Girardota, Colombia
10 Apr 201063.7InstalledBishop of Girardota, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Guillermo Orozco Montoya:
Bishop Guillermo Orozco Montoya (born ) Bishop of Girardota

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Girardota.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Jan 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,086
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013