Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edgar Hernando Tirado Mazo, M.X.Y.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tierradentro

Titular Bishop of Zaba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1939 BornMedellin
29 Nov 197031.7Ordained PriestPriest of Misioneros Javerianos de Yarumal
199656.8AppointedSuperior General of Misioneros Javerianos de Yarumal
200262.8ResignedSuperior General of Misioneros Javerianos de Yarumal
19 Dec 200364.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tierradentro, Colombia
19 Dec 200364.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Zaba
31 Mar 200465.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zaba
5 Jun 201576.2RetiredVicar Apostolic of Tierradentro, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Edgar Hernando Tirado Mazo:
Bishop Edgar Hernando Tirado Mazo M.X.Y. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tierradentro

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Tierradentro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,556
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 Jun 2015