Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillermo Escobar Vélez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Antioquía


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1909BornLa Estrella
1 Apr 193324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Medellín, Colombia
7 Mar 195243.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antioquía, Colombia
7 Mar 195243.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Attuda
27 Apr 195243.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Attuda
1 Apr 195546.3AppointedBishop of Antioquía, Colombia
28 Jul 196960.6ResignedBishop of Antioquía, Colombia
28 Jul 196960.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicives
22 Jan 197162.1ResignedTitular Bishop of Nicives
30 Oct 198677.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Antioquía, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Guillermo Escobar Vélez:
Bishop Guillermo Escobar Vélez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Antioquía

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013