Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edgar Aristizábal Quintero

Auxiliary Bishop of Medellín

Titular Bishop of Castra Galbae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1965 BornCartago
7 Dec 199025.0Ordained PriestPriest of Cartago, Colombia
4 May 201145.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Medellín, Colombia
4 May 201145.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Castra Galbae
4 Jun 201145.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castra Galbae

MicroData Summary for Edgar Aristizábal Quintero:
Bishop Edgar Aristizábal Quintero (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Medellín

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Medellín.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 6 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,069

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013