Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Manuel González Arbeláez

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Popayán

Titular Archbishop of Oxyrynchus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1892BornRionegro
17 Jan 191523.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 193341.5AppointedBishop of Manizales, Colombia
29 Oct 193341.8Ordained BishopBishop of Manizales, Colombia
6 Jun 193442.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aenus
20 Jun 194250.4AppointedArchbishop of Popayán, Colombia
1 Feb 194452.0ResignedArchbishop of Popayán, Colombia
1 Feb 194452.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Oxyrynchus
4 Jan 196674.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Popayán, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Juan Manuel González Arbeláez:
Archbishop Juan Manuel González Arbeláez (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Popayán

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013