Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Antonio Medina y Medina

Deceased

Bishop of Montería


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1916BornTenza
3 Jun 194427.4Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jul 195235.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cali, Colombia
16 Jul 195235.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cephas
28 Oct 195235.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cephas
1959²42.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Medellín, Colombia
23 Mar 196447.2AppointedBishop of Montería, Colombia
20 May 197255.4DiedBishop of Montería, Colombia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Antonio Medina y Medina:
Bishop Miguel Antonio Medina y Medina (born , died ) Bishop of Montería

  • a priest for 27.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 104

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015