Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Włodzimierz Cardinal Czacki

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1834Born
30 Nov 186733.6Ordained PriestPriest
12 Aug 187945.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Salamis
17 Aug 187945.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Salamis
19 Sep 187945.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
25 Sep 188248.4Elevated to Cardinal
15 Mar 188348.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
8 Mar 188853.8DiedApostolic Nuncio to France

MicroData Summary for Włodzimierz Czacki (VIAF: 51078047)
Włodzimierz Cardinal Czacki (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of France

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoryck, Diocese of Lutsk and Zhytomyr (Łuck and Zytomierz), Ukraine
Ordained PriestOdescalchi palace, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Louis des Francais, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Odescalchi family tomb, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Caetani family crypt, S. Pudenziana, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 20.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
  • a cardinal for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 491, and Page 52
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 25 Sep 1882
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017