Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Komornicki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

Titular Bishop of Caesaropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1733³BornDambrovec
18 Jul 175622.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Sep 175623.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 177440.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
28 Feb 177440.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
10 Apr 177440.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
10 May 178046.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Komornicki:
Bishop Franciszek Komornicki (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

  • a priest for 23.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 137, and Page 454
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,891
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1774, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 20 Dec 2015