Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Stanisław Witwicki

Deceased

Bishop of Poznań


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1638¹BornSmolnik
12 Jun 167941.4AppointedBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
25 May 168244.3AppointedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
24 Nov 168749.8AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
12 Jan 168850.0InstalledBishop of Poznań, Poland
4 May 169860.3DiedBishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Stanisław Witwicki:
Bishop Jan Stanisław Witwicki (born 1638, died ) Bishop of Poznań

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 232, and Page 248
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 322
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1679, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 30 Apr 2015