Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefan Antonin Mdzewski, O.P. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

Titular Bishop of Calama


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1653Born
2 May 167118.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
11 Jan 169037.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
11 Jan 169037.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Calama
12 Mar 169037.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calama
13 Aug 169946.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
16 May 171865.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Stefan Antonin Mdzewski:
Bishop Stefan Antonin Mdzewski O.P. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,858
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 14 Jan 2014