Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joachim Henryk Przebendowski

Deceased

Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1675³BornJaniszewie
25 May 170933.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Jan 171034.5Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 171539.7SelectedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
5 Oct 171641.2ConfirmedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
21 May 172145.8DiedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joachim Henryk Przebendowski:
Bishop Joachim Henryk Przebendowski (born , died ) Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

  • a priest for 11.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 248
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1716, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 10 Aug 2015