Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paweł Wołucki

Deceased

Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1560¹Born
5 Dec 159434.9AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
1595¹35.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
30 Jul 160747.5AppointedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
19 May 161656.3AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
15 Nov 162262.8DiedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paweł Wołucki (VIAF: 164514032)
Bishop Paweł Wołucki (born 1560, died ) Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArchdiocese of Gniezno

  • a bishop for 27.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 130, and Page 224
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 372
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 148
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1595, Number 1*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast