Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Łubieński

Deceased

Bishop of Płock


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1574BornŁubnej
26 Feb 162450.1AppointedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
Jun 1624³50.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
30 Aug 162753.6AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
16 Apr 164066.2DiedBishop of Płock, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Łubieński:
Bishop Stanisław Łubieński (died ) Bishop of Płock

  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 224, and Page 283
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 24 Feb 2015