Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mikołaj Jan Prażmowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617Born
1 Dec 165942.9AppointedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
9 Nov 166447.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
11 Oct 166649.7AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
15 Apr 167356.2DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Mikołaj Jan Prażmowski
Archbishop Mikołaj Jan Prażmowski (born 1617, died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 195, and Page 225
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1664, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast